U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20128
  • Case Name: Virginia Fuerstenberger and Clark Fuerstenberger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule J]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Addendum]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedule J]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Addendum]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.