U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20134
  • Case Name: Kristy Jean Rentz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Property Sold]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • October 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.