U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Jefferson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [USCA Order]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 27, 2020: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • September 25, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • July 06, 2020: [Letter(s)]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Letter(s)]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 05, 2019: [Reply to Response]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 01, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • March 19, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 19, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.