U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00172
  • Case Name: RK et al v. Sweetwater County School District No 1 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 04, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 05, 2019: [Withdrawal of Document]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Compel]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.