U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20144
  • Case Name: Jerry Lira and Jessica Lira
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.