U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20151
  • Case Name: Delano L Lee and Daisy May Lee
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
June, 2020
  • June 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
January, 2020
  • January 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Relief from Stay]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Relief from Stay]
July, 2019
  • July 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Social Security Number]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.