U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Torian v. Shanahan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 26, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 26, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 14, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 07, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • April 18, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 22, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • March 22, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.