U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Hill v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.