U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00060
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Edwards et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • October 18, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Status Report]
  • October 03, 2019: [Status Report Order]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • March 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.