U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Schrader v. Lang et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • September 09, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 03, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • June 15, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Status Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Status Report Order]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 25, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • April 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 22, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • March 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.