U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20156
  • Case Name: Johnathan David Johnston, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
  • April 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • April 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Social Security Number]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.