U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 04-21148
  • Case Name: Frank Arthur Pascarelli and Linda Rae Pascarelli
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Avoid Lien]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Reopen Chapter 13 Case]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Proposed Order]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Avoid Lien]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Reopen Chapter 13 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.