U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Danzik v. CWT Canada II Limited Partnership et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
  • May 14, 2019: [Response]
  • May 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • May 03, 2019: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
  • May 03, 2019: [Transcript]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Strike]
  • April 19, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • April 10, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • April 10, 2019: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
  • March 27, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.