U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20169
  • Case Name: Vicky K Johnston and Daniel L Johnston
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.