U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20179
  • Case Name: Christopher James Pacileo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
March, 2020
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
April, 2019
  • April 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.