U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20186
  • Case Name: Autumn Faye Forbes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2019
  • July 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.