U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20190
  • Case Name: Brandon Scott Boor and Jennifer Lee Boor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2019
  • April 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.