U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Davenport v. Rentokil North America Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • March 18, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Vacating Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Setting Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • December 15, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 11, 2020: [Response]
  • December 11, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 11, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • December 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [In Limine]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 03, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [In Limine]
  • November 20, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 06, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 05, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 05, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 06, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 03, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 09, 2019: [Payment Entry]
  • September 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 25, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • June 25, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 14, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 24, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 02, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • April 22, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • April 19, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Removal]
  • April 10, 2019: [Complaint]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.