open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Wyoming

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Wyoming
    Case Number:19-20213
    Party Name:James Warren Dreben and Jamie Lee Dreben
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wyb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?49139
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =