U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20219
  • Case Name: Susan D. Lathrop and Robert L. Lathrop
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.