U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Allgier v. Jepson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 26, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • February 11, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • January 31, 2020: [Designation]
  • January 24, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 06, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Brief]
  • December 13, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 13, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 11, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 06, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 05, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 09, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • April 29, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • April 23, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2019: [Removal]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Complaint]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.