U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20221
  • Case Name: Season M Shumaker and Daniel J Shumaker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
October, 2022
  • October 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Completion of Plan Pymts]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.