U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Pilcher v. Winship et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 12, 2019: [Mail Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 25, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 14, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • October 01, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 30, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • September 27, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 10, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • August 09, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Disqualify]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 07, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • August 06, 2019: [Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 22, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2019: [Disqualify]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 11, 2019: [Strike]
  • June 11, 2019: [Response]
  • June 10, 2019: [Strike]
  • June 04, 2019: [Objection]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Response]
  • May 29, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • May 29, 2019: [Strike]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 06, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • April 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • April 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.