U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20226
  • Case Name: Terry L. Kettle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2019
  • July 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Intent]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule J]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule I]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule H]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule G]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule E/F]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule D]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule C]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.