U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00063
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 1106 Julie Lane, Powell Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 04, 2019: [Service by Publication]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.