U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Sweets v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Honor Farm Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Mail Returned]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Brief]
  • November 06, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 07, 2019: [Reply to Response]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Response]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 18, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.