U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Carroll v. Routh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Financial Entry]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 29, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 28, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 25, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 16, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 16, 2019: [Strike]
  • July 15, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • July 08, 2019: [Opposition]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 28, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • April 29, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 22, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 22, 2019: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.