U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation v. JAG Automotive of Laramie LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • April 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Status Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2019: [Minute Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [Objection]
  • November 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 05, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • November 05, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 24, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 24, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 24, 2019: [Temporary Restraining Order]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Vacating Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 01, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 19, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Brief]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • June 10, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • June 10, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 31, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 10, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 22, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.