U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20243
  • Case Name: Robert Jason Sorensen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • May 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
November, 2020
  • November 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • October 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
April, 2019
  • April 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.