U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20259
  • Case Name: Todd Allen Honadel and Ashley Louise Honadel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • June 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • June 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.