U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20265
  • Case Name: Carl D. Emmett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Complaint]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Appointment Rejection]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Social Security Number]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.