U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co v. CIGNA Healthcare Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Financial Entry]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Stipulation]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 20, 2019: [Crossclaim]
  • September 19, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • September 05, 2019: [Deposit Funds]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 04, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • August 23, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • August 16, 2019: [Mail Returned]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 31, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • July 29, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 19, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 02, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.