U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20268
  • Case Name: Timothy Robert McConnell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Generic Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Employ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Employ]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Warner,, Trustee David J. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
June, 2019
  • June 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Take Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Social Security Number]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.