U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Sparks v. Riverton WY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 15, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 20, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 12, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 29, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.