U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Phillips & Jordan Inc v. Erosion Control Applications Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 25, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Response]
  • September 16, 2020: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 14, 2020: [Status Report]
  • September 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Show Cause]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • May 07, 2020: [Stay Case]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • April 09, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 05, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 03, 2020: [Set Aside]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • February 10, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 08, 2019: [Default Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.