U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20284
  • Case Name: Andy James Titus
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2019
  • June 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.