U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20287
  • Case Name: Stephen Carl Curtright
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Transmittal of Unclaimed Funds]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement of Property Sold]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement of Property Sold]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
July, 2019
  • July 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Declaration]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Amended List of Creditors (Fee)]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.