U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Murray v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • May 17, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • May 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 09, 2019: [Removal]
  • May 09, 2019: [Complaint]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.