U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20291
  • Case Name: Eber Edward Butler
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Dismiss Case - Trustee]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.