U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20293
  • Case Name: Maria Victoria Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Affidavit]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
August, 2022
  • August 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Affidavit]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
  • October 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
  • September 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal of Claim]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • June 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim(s)]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirm 13 Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
September, 2019
  • September 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order (Generic)]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Stipulation]
  • September 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule A/B]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule J]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule I]
June, 2019
  • June 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • June 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Exhibit]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule J]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule I]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule H]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule G]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule E/F]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule D]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule C]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Social Security Number]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.