U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Fisk v. Affinity Gaming LLC Chief Executive Officer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 29, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 19, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Letter(s)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 14, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • May 10, 2019: [Service of Process]
  • May 10, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 10, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 10, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.