U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Woods v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • July 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 05, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • June 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • June 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • June 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 15, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • September 02, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • September 02, 2021: [Response]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 13, 2021: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • July 09, 2021: [Requiring Service and Response]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Brief]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Status Report]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • May 13, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.