U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Williams v. RGIS LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • December 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Vacating Hearing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 08, 2020: [Stay Case]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • September 13, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 29, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 13, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • May 13, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.