U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Hoose v. Pettersen MD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 07, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 05, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • May 20, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 13, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.