U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20299
  • Case Name: Cortnie Lyn Carpenter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
June, 2019
  • June 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • June 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.