U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00093
  • Case Name: BNSF Railway Company v. Pickrel Land & Cattle Company Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 07, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 26, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 21, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 19, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 15, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 18, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.