U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Blazek v. Maul
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 13, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 03, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 10, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
  • November 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • November 11, 2019: [Designation]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 05, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 04, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • November 04, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 04, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Request for Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • September 06, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 03, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 20, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 02, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Status Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Status Report Order]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Acceptance of Service]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.