U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00099
  • Case Name: VanWagoner et al v. Singh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 19, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 18, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 12, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 24, 2019: [Acceptance of Service]
  • May 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Removal]
  • May 15, 2019: [Complaint]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.