U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Abdul Rahman Bin Soufayan v. AlSouad
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 16, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Impending Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Impending Dismissal]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 05, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.