U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Obray et al v. TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • October 15, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 15, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 03, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 25, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 05, 2020: [Response]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 14, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • February 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 06, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 23, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • December 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 10, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • December 10, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Sanctions]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 07, 2019: [Compel]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 27, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 21, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 14, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 09, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • July 10, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Removal]
  • May 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • May 16, 2019: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Complaint]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.